Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brian J Schules, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Catherine J Mesiano, against John Does 1-5, Lincoln Bp Management Inc., Lincoln Property Company, Mount Laurel Crossing, S 1-5 Abc Business Entitie, (total of 5) See All represented by Bryan P Regan, Suzanne M Marasco, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Anthony M Pugliese presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony M Pugliese Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by MARASCO, SUZANNE, M of HILL WALLACK LLP on behalf of MOUNT LAUREL CROSSING against BRIAN J SCHULES | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT submitted by MESIANO, CATHERINE, J of GRUNGO COLARULO LLC on behalf of BRIAN J SCHULES against MOUNT LAUREL CROSSING, LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY, LINCOLN BP MANAGEMENT INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1-5 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by REGAN, BRYAN, P of GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP on behalf of LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY, LINCOLN BP MANAGEMENT INC. against BRIAN J SCHULES | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by MARASCO, SUZANNE, M of HILL WALLACK LLP on behalf of MOUNT LAUREL CROSSING against BRIAN J SCHULES | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by MESIANO, CATHERINE, J of GRUNGO COLARULO LLC on behalf of BRIAN J SCHULES against MOUNT LAUREL CROSSING, LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY, LINCOLN BP MANAGEMENT INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1-5 | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by MESIANO, CATHERINE, J of GRUNGO COLARULO LLC on behalf of BRIAN J SCHULES against MOUNT LAUREL CROSSING, LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY, LINCOLN BP MANAGEMENT INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1-5 | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for CAM-L-002413-22 submitted by MESIANO, CATHERINE J, GRUNGO COLARULO LLC on behalf of BRIAN J SCHULES against MOUNT LAUREL CROSSING, LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY, LINCOLN BP MANAGEMENT INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1-5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.