Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pennrose Llc, filed a(n) Mt. Laurel case represented by Richard J Perr, against Andre Oliveriera, Annette L Smith, Aparecida S Coutinho, Apc Associates Llc, Carl Muller, (total of 64) See All represented by Anthony P Costa, Douglas Lynn Heinold, Mark G Carusillo, in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with Paula T Dow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula T Dow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2018 |
CategoryMt. Laurel |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DOUGLAS LYNN HEINOLD
Date: May 30, 2018TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 05, 2018Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JEFFREY I BARON
Date: May 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2020 |
TRIAL
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
April 20, 2020 |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
January 03, 2020 |
STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by HEINOLD, DOUGLAS, LYNN of RAYMOND COLEMAN HEINOLD LLP on behalf of JOHN S RADOMSKI, JOSEPH CAVALIERI, SCOTT G KERN, MARIE E KERN, CAROL L RADOMSKI against PENNROSE LLC | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence submitted by Staff | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Memorandum uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge Paula T. Dow, P.J.Ch. | |
December 09, 2019 |
STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.