Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pemberton Township, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Andrew Bayer, against Internal Revenue Service, James Brandt, Jay G Trachtenberg, Jesse Brandt, John Brandt, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with Paula T Dow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula T Dow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2017 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Case Outcome TypeCompleted-Other Summary Proceeding |
Proof Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW BAYER
Date: July 27, 2017Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOHN BRANDT
Date: August 16, 2017Order To Vacate Order - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: January 26, 2018Brief uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW BAYER
Date: February 20, 2018General Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: June 25, 2020Certification uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by STAN R GREGORY
Date: February 07, 2018Certification uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by STAN R GREGORY
Date: March 05, 2018Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: September 15, 2017Notice Of Appeal uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOHN BRANDT
Date: April 04, 2018General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW BAYER
Date: August 18, 2017Oath Of Commissioners uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by STAN R GREGORY
Date: January 22, 2018Brief uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW BAYER
Date: July 11, 2017Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: March 01, 2018Letter Of Opinion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW BAYER
Date: January 25, 2018Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: January 23, 2018General Correspondence submitted by Staff
Date: July 05, 2017Letter Of Opinion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOHN BRANDT
Date: February 13, 2018Order For Payment Into Court - GRANTED by Judge BOOKBINDER, RONALD, E
Date: May 23, 2017Order Extending Time For Filing Of Document - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: November 08, 2017Waiver Of Fees submitted by Court
Date: August 16, 2017Order Show Cause - GRANTED by Judge BOOKBINDER, RONALD, E
Date: May 23, 2017Complaint uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW BAYER
Date: May 09, 2017Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Staff
Date: February 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | General Correspondence submitted by Court | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Staff | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by BAYER, ANDREW of PASHMAN STEIN WALDER HAYDEN, PC on behalf of PEMBERTON TOWNSHIP against JOSEPH BRITTON ESTATE OF | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by CLARK, DAVID, ALLAN of GLUCKWALRATH LLP on behalf of PEMBERTON TOWNSHIP against JOHN BRANDT | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Of Appeal uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOHN BRANDT | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Certification uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by STAN R GREGORY | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Brief uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW BAYER | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Of Opinion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOHN BRANDT | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Certification uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by STAN R GREGORY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.