Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Partners Mt Laurel Llc, filed a(n) Actions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs case represented by Tracy Siebold, against Mount Laurel Township Municip, in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with Paula T Dow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula T Dow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2016 |
CategoryActions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2016 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
August 25, 2016 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
August 25, 2016 |
SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
July 15, 2016 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
June 24, 2016 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
May 02, 2016 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.