Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ilm Center Associates Lp, filed a(n) Actions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs case represented by Cheryl Lynn Walters, against Township Of Moorestown, in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with Paula T Dow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula T Dow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2020 |
CategoryActions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 17, 2020CORRECTION-LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 18, 2020LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 15, 2020TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2020 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRECTION-LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 15, 2020 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by WALTERS, CHERYL LYNN of NEHMAD PERILLO DAVIS & GOLDSTEIN, P.C. on behalf of ILM CENTER ASSOCIATES LP against TOWNSHIP OF MOORESTOWN | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE submitted by WALTERS, CHERYL LYNN of NEHMAD PERILLO DAVIS & GOLDSTEIN, P.C. on behalf of ILM CENTER ASSOCIATES LP against TOWNSHIP OF MOORESTOWN | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint for BUR-L-000317-20 submitted by WALTERS, CHERYL LYNN , NEHMAD PERILLO DAVIS & GOLDSTEIN, P.C. on behalf of ILM CENTER ASSOCIATES, LP against TOWNSHIP OF MOORESTOWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.