Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Silvia Diaz, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janice Heinold, against Yekini Y Sani, in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with James J Ferrelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames J Ferrelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2023 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by Silvia Diaz against Yekini Y Sani in the Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County. The complaint alleges a breach of contract regarding a commercial lease agreement. According to the complaint, the lease was entered ...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 10, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by HEINOLD, JANICE of RAYMOND COLEMAN HEINOLD LLP on behalf of SILVIA DIAZ against YEKINI Y SANI | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [LCV20231289902] -Service upon 'POST' is not acceptable service. Please identify who was served. | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by HEINOLD, JANICE of RAYMOND COLEMAN HEINOLD LLP on behalf of SILVIA DIAZ against YEKINI Y SANI | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint for BUR-L-000307-23 submitted by HEINOLD, JANICE , RAYMOND COLEMAN HEINOLD LLP on behalf of SILVIA DIAZ against YEKINI Y SANI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.