Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Danielle Scheidler, Robert Scheidler, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gregory M Mc Namee, against -10 Jane And John Does 1, Abc Corps. 1-10, Jackson Commons C-4Llc, Promark F&I Servicesllc, S&P Real Estate Company Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Kenneth Martin Courtney, in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with James J Ferrelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames J Ferrelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by MC NAMEE, GREGORY, M of DEVINE TIMONEY LAW GROUP on behalf of ROBERT SCHEIDLER, DANIELLE SCHEIDLER against PROMARK F&I SERVICESLLC, S&P REAL ESTATE COMPANY LLC, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10, JACKSON COMMONS C-4 LLC | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by MC NAMEE, GREGORY, M of DEVINE TIMONEY LAW GROUP on behalf of ROBERT SCHEIDLER, DANIELLE SCHEIDLER against PROMARK F&I SERVICESLLC, S&P REAL ESTATE COMPANY LLC, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10, JACKSON COMMONS C-4 LLC | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by MC NAMEE, GREGORY, M of DEVINE TIMONEY LAW GROUP on behalf of ROBERT SCHEIDLER, DANIELLE SCHEIDLER against PROMARK F&I SERVICESLLC, S&P REAL ESTATE COMPANY LLC, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10, JACKSON COMMONS C-4 LLC | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by MC NAMEE, GREGORY, M of DEVINE TIMONEY LAW GROUP on behalf of ROBERT SCHEIDLER, DANIELLE SCHEIDLER against PROMARK F&I SERVICESLLC, S&P REAL ESTATE COMPANY LLC, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10, JACKSON COMMONS C-4 LLC | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by MC NAMEE, GREGORY, M of DEVINE TIMONEY LAW GROUP on behalf of ROBERT SCHEIDLER, DANIELLE SCHEIDLER against PROMARK F&I SERVICESLLC, S&P REAL ESTATE COMPANY LLC, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10 | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20232301328] -Other Motion order to file amended complaint has been granted and entered into eCourts. Please file your amended complaint through eCourts to be processed. Thank you. | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT-Granted by Judge FERRELLI, JAMES, J re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20232301328] | |
September 16, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.