Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Innova Atlantic Wh Operations, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jennifer Almquist, against Kimberlee Loper, Robert Loper, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Sarah B Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah B Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 23, 2022Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by KIMBERLEE LOPER
Date: October 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20231311595] -A Motion to Vacate is needed in order to vacate default. Plese make sure to include a proposed form of Answer as an exhibit to your motion. Thank you. | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by CULLETON, CHRISTOPHER, J of SWARTZ CULLETON PC on behalf of INNOVA ATLANTIC WH OPERATIONS against ROBERT LOPER, KIMBERLEE LOPER | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by ALMQUIST, JENNIFER of COWART DIZZIA LLP on behalf of INNOVA ATLANTIC WH OPERATIONS against ROBERT LOPER | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: ROBERT LOPER | |
March 04, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV2023675746] -In the future, kindly file all documents on ECourts. An Amended Answer would be needed in order to correct. Thank you. | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JENNIFER ALMQUIST | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by ALMQUIST, JENNIFER of COWART DIZZIA LLP on behalf of INNOVA ATLANTIC WH OPERATIONS against ROBERT LOPER | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by ALMQUIST, JENNIFER of COWART DIZZIA LLP on behalf of INNOVA ATLANTIC WH OPERATIONS against KIMBERLEE LOPER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.