Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Robert Morris, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by David Rock Castellani, against Elen Manalang, John Does 1-10, Mamta Patel, State Of New Jersey, Stockton University, (total of 5) See All represented by Leo Boerstoel, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Sarah B Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah B Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryLaw Against Discrimination (Lad) Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) [LCV2023750051] -In the future, kindly include your attorney bar ID on all pleadings. Thank you. | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by FUCHS, ANDREW, ROBERT of ATTORNEY GENERAL LAW on behalf of STOCKTON UNIVERSITY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, MAMTA PATEL, ELEN MANALANG against ROBERT MORRIS | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by BOERSTOEL, LEO of ATTORNEY GENERAL LAW on behalf of STOCKTON UNIVERSITY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, MAMTA PATEL, ELEN MANALANG against ROBERT MORRIS | |
February 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: SARAH B JOHNSON |
||
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL-Granted by Judge JOHNSON, SARAH, B re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV2023262295] | |
February 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: SARAH B JOHNSON |
||
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/13/2023 was rescheduled to 02/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV2023262295] | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/13/2023 will be decided on 02/03/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV2023262295] | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL submitted by DRAPER, PETER, M of ATTORNEY GENERAL LAW on behalf of STOCKTON UNIVERSITY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, MAMTA PATEL, ELEN MANALANG against ROBERT MORRIS | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by BOERSTOEL, LEO of ATTORNEY GENERAL LAW on behalf of STOCKTON UNIVERSITY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, MAMTA PATEL, ELEN MANALANG against ROBERT MORRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.