Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mark Thomsen, filed a(n) Proceed Mesh/Patch case represented by Joshua S Kincannon, against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson And Johnson, represented by Kelly Strange Crawford, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with John C Porto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C Porto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryProceed Mesh/Patch |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by KOTT, DAVID, R of MC CARTER & ENGLISH LLP on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, ETHICON, INC. against MARK THOMSEN | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by CRAWFORD, KELLY, STRANGE of RIKER DANZIG LLP on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON against MARK THOMSEN | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by CRAWFORD, KELLY, STRANGE of RIKER DANZIG LLP on behalf of ETHICON, INC. against MARK THOMSEN | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by KINCANNON, JOSHUA, S of WILENTZ GOLDMAN & SPITZER on behalf of MARK THOMSEN against JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, ETHICON, INC. | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ATL-L-002558-22 submitted by KINCANNON, JOSHUA S, WILENTZ GOLDMAN & SPITZER on behalf of MARK THOMSEN against JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, ETHICON, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.