Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leona Akins-Smith, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Albert J Olizi, against Capital H1 D B A Renault Winer, Flight Entertainment, represented by Christopher P Morgan, Steven A Jenks, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Stanley L Bergman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStanley L Bergman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by MORGAN, CHRISTOPHER, P of DENGLER & LIPSKI on behalf of CAPITAL H1 D/B/A RENAULT WINER against LEONA AKINS-SMITH | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by JENKS, STEVEN, A of REILLY MCDEVITT & HENRICH, PC on behalf of FLIGHT ENTERTAINMENT against LEONA AKINS-SMITH | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by OLIZI, ALBERT, J of MATTLEMAN WEINROTH & MILLER, PC on behalf of LEONA AKINS-SMITH against CAPITAL H1 D/B/A RENAULT WINER, FLIGHT ENTERTAINMENT | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ATL-L-002554-22 submitted by OLIZI, ALBERT J, MATTLEMAN WEINROTH & MILLER, PC on behalf of LEONA AKINS-SMITH against CAPITAL H1 D/B/A RENAULT WINER, FLIGHT ENTERTAINMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.