Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Peter Martin, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brett Michael Walker, against 0 Xyz Corporations 1-1, Cafi Di Roma, John Doe 1-10, Pizza Di Roma, Redzep Alili, (total of 5) See All represented by Craig L Chaney, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with John C Porto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C Porto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY | ||
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/24/2023 will be decided on 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20232162886] | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by WALKER, BRETT, MICHAEL of LOUIS B. HIMMELSTEIN & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of PETER MARTIN against PIZZA DI ROMA, CAFI DI ROMA, REDZEP ALILI | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by CHANEY, CRAIG, L of WADE CLARK MULCAHY LLP on behalf of PIZZA DI ROMA, CAFI DI ROMA, REDZEP ALILI against PETER MARTIN, JOHN DOE 1-10, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
September 17, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ATL-L-002546-22 submitted by WALKER, BRETT MICHAEL, LOUIS B. HIMMELSTEIN & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of PETER MARTIN against PIZZA DI ROMA, CAFI DI ROMA, REDZEP ALILI, JOHN DOE 1-10, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.