Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Frank Timek, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Louis Michael Barbone, against City Of Atlantic City, represented by Steven S Glickman, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with John C Porto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C Porto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryEmployment (Other Than Cepa Or Lad) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 17, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 29, 2023ORDER TO REFER TO MEDIATOR WITHOUT STAY - GRANTED by Judge JOHN C. PORTO,P.J. CIV.
Date: March 13, 2023MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by BARBONE, LOUIS, MICHAEL of JACOBS & BARBONE, PA on behalf of FRANK TIMEK against CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY | |
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO REFER TO MEDIATOR WITHOUT STAY - GRANTED by Judge JOHN C. PORTO,P.J. CIV. | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by GLICKMAN, STEVEN, S of STEVEN S. GLICKMAN,LLC on behalf of CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY against FRANK TIMEK | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by GLICKMAN, STEVEN, S of STEVEN S. GLICKMAN,LLC on behalf of CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY against FRANK TIMEK | |
September 17, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ATL-L-002544-22 submitted by BARBONE, LOUIS MICHAEL, JACOBS & BARBONE, PA on behalf of FRANK TIMEK against CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.