Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Katie Freiermuth, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Thomas Francis Flynn, against #1-5 Richard Roe Company, 5 John Doe Company #1-, -5 Richard Roe, Inc. #1, Co. #1-5 John Doe Management, Get Air Mays Landingllc, (total of 8) See All represented by Laura M Faustino, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Ralph A Paolone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Paolone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by FALCIONE, ALFRED, JOSEPH of FLYNN & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of KATIE FREIERMUTH against GET AIR MAYS LANDINGLLC, GET AIR TRAMPOLINE PARK | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge PAOLONE, RALPH, A re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20231724158] | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by FAUSTINO, LAURA, M of TRAUB LIEBERMAN STRAUS & SHREWSBERRY LLP on behalf of GET AIR MAYS LANDINGLLC, GET AIR TRAMPOLINE PARK against KATIE FREIERMUTH | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO DISCOVERY DELINQUENCY-Granted by Judge PAOLONE, RALPH, A re: MOTION DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO DISCOVERY DELINQUENCY [LCV20231437262] | |
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO DISCOVERY DELINQUENCY
Judge: RALPH A PAOLONE |
||
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO DISCOVERY DELINQUENCY submitted by FALCIONE, ALFRED, JOSEPH of FLYNN & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of KATIE FREIERMUTH against GET AIR MAYS LANDINGLLC, GET AIR TRAMPOLINE PARK | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/03/2023 will be decided on 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO DISCOVERY DELINQUENCY [LCV20231437262] | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge PAOLONE, RALPH, A re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV2023434506] | |
March 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: RALPH A PAOLONE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.