We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Fidel Cruz Vs. Crescent Hotels & Resorts, Llc

Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago

Cruz, Fidel, On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Allen Feghali, against Crescent Hotels & Resorts, Llc, Does 1-10, represented by William C. Sung, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.

Case Details

Filing Date

April 20, 2021

Last Refreshed

March 01, 2022

Filing Location

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Christopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Unlimited

Practice Area

Labor and Employment

Matter Type

General Employment

Case Documents

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00

Answer filed.

Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00

Order After Hearing filed.

Date: January 14, 2022

Complaint filed.

Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00

Summons filed.

Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Hearing Case Management Conference - Complex
Heard
Docket Event This case is reassigned to department 28 for Complex Case Management.
Docket Event Minutes finalized for heard on 01/28/2022 08:46:00 AM .
Docket Event The Status Conference - Complex RE: Final Accounting is scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 28.
Docket Event Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 01/28/2022 10:00:00 AM .
Docket Event Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Docket Event Status Conference - Complex scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Docket Event Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 01/28/2022 10:00:00 AM published .
Docket Event Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Judge: Christopher E. Krueger

Docket Event Order After Hearing filed.
See all events