Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gustin, Darlene, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clayeo C Arnold, against Does 1-25, Taboada, Leandro, represented by Leslie A Romeo, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 12/02/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: February 02, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.