Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Group One Construction, Inc., Foust, Richard L., filed a(n) Civil case against Contractors' State License Board, California Office Of Administrative Hearings, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James P. Arguelles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Arguelles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Declaration - Other (Of Joshua D. Johnson ISO Opposition) filed.
Date: October 23, 2020Petition for Writ of Mandate (Prohibition) filed.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Proposed Order (Ditecting Issuance Of Alternative Writ Of Prohibition) filed.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (For Alternative Writ Of Prohibition) filed.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Alternative Writ of Prohibition) filed.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (To Exparte Application for Alternative Writ of Prohibition) filed.
Date: October 23, 2020Group One v. CSLB (Ex parte)
Date: October 29, 2020Tentative Ruling Filed
Date: October 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Stay of Administrative Hearing) filed.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: October 15, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.