Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mensch, Amy, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Baeza, Jose Hermosillo, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: September 18, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: December 30, 2020Telephone Appearance Permanent Hearing
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: November 18, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: September 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: October 02, 2020Response filed.
Date: November 18, 2020Zoom (Remote Appearance) Permanent Hearing (Civil Harassment
Date: December 30, 2020Minute Order 12/30/2020
Date: December 30, 2020Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.