Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kister, Neesa, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Tapia, Christian, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Order - Other (CH-116) filed.
Date: February 03, 2020Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: February 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Request - Other (CH-116) filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Restraining Order After Hearing To Stop Harassment (Permanent Order) filed.
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order 02/28/2020
Date: February 28, 2020Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: March 09, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.