Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Graham, Isaiah, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Stallworth Jr, Maurice, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David De Alba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid De Alba Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions117 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order 02/21/2020
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: March 30, 2020Minute Order 05/26/2020
Date: May 26, 2020Telephone Appearance Permanent Hearing (Civil Harassment)
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: April 29, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.