Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Valdez, Chloe, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Vanover, Edward, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Minute Order 02/21/2020
Date: February 21, 2020Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: January 30, 2020Restraining Order After Hearing To Stop Harassment (Permanent Order) filed.
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: January 31, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: February 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.