Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shannon, Derek, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Romig, Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions24 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 14, 2020Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: January 28, 2020Mediation Agreement 02/21/2020
Date: February 21, 2020Response filed.
Date: February 14, 2020Minute Order 02/21/2020
Date: February 21, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: January 31, 2020Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Response (Response to Request to Terminate CHRO) filed.
Date: February 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.