Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arey, Benjamin Lewis, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proposed Decree filed.
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed.
Date: October 09, 2020Proof of Publication filed.
Date: October 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: September 01, 2020Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: October 15, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.