Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gregory G. Smith, Md, Gregory G. Smith, Md, A California Professional Medical Corporation, Yambalia, Carmelita, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by James D Gustafson, against Artham, Sarath, David Kyle, D.O., Davila, Mirla, Does 1-100, Dr Catalyst Llc, A Puerto Rico Limited Liability Company, (total of 11) See All represented by Stephen J Erigero, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThadd A. Blizzard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed.
Date: October 23, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.
Date: September 09, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: September 02, 2020Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.
Date: October 01, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.