Drake, Peyton,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Allen H. Sumner presiding.
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
August 24, 2020
Docket Event
Status Conference - Minors Compromise scheduled for 12/04/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 42 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .
Judge: Allen H. Sumner
August 19, 2020
Docket Event
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim (Re: Peyton Drake) filed.
August 19, 2020
Docket Event
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
August 19, 2020
Docket Event
Kay, Harsha added as a Guardian Ad Litem CR effective 08/19/2020 .
August 19, 2020
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Granted .
August 19, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. (Re: Peyton Drake) filed.
August 19, 2020
Docket Event
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) has been Granted .
August 17, 2020
Docket Event
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed.
August 17, 2020
Docket Event
Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability filed.