Klassen, Keith,
Trustee Of The Copper Sunset Trust,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Eric R. Garner,
against
As Administrator Of The Estate Of Edna Hardie,
Colwell, Gwen,
Does 1-10,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Details for
Klassen, Keith v. As Administrator Of The Estate Of Edna Hardie
, et al.
Case Events for
Klassen, Keith v. As Administrator Of The Estate Of Edna Hardie
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
July 22, 2020
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/06/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
July 22, 2020
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
July 08, 2020
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
July 08, 2020
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
July 08, 2020
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
March 13, 2020
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
February 07, 2020
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/06/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
February 07, 2020
Docket Event
Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/07/2020 .