Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
White, James W., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Thomas, Melinda, Love, Yvonne, Does 1-100, represented by G Cat Stokes, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Opposition (to Demurrer to Complaint) filed.
Date: June 15, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: July 17, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Demurrer and Continuance of Hearing) filed.
Date: June 05, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Telephonic Meet and confer) filed.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 19, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 05/19/2020 01:04:00 PM .
Date: May 19, 2020Request - Other (for Court Reporter by Party with Fee Waiver) filed.
Date: June 15, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.