Mitchell, Steve,
Mitchell, Jennifer,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David I. Brown presiding.
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/03/2020 02:00:00 PM .
June 03, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Heard
Judge: David I. Brown
June 03, 2020
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Granted .
June 03, 2020
Docket Event
Petition for Change of Name has been Granted .
June 03, 2020
Docket Event
Decree Changing Name filed.
May 08, 2020
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/08/2020 02:00:00 PM .
May 08, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David I. Brown
May 08, 2020
Hearing
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard
Judge: David I. Brown
March 20, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Scheduled