We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Latini, John M.
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
against
Jamison, David ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
February 04, 2020
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
105 days
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Matter Type
General Employment
Other Parties
Latini, John M. (Appellant)
State Labor Commissioner (Interested Party)
Case Events for
v. Jamison, David
Date
Type
Description
June 03, 2020
Docket Event
Appeal on the Award of Labor Comm disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 19, 2020
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
Get Document
May 19, 2020
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 19, 2020
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
April 01, 2020
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Short Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 04/01/2020 01:38:00 PM .
Get Document
April 01, 2020
Hearing
Civil Trial Assignment - Short Cause - Civil Trial Assignment Heard
April 01, 2020
Docket Event
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Get Document
March 27, 2020
Hearing
Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment Scheduled
February 05, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 03/27/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .
Get Document
February 04, 2020
Docket Event
Appeal on the Award of Labor Comm filed.
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.