Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Abraham, Diane, Abraham, John, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Anthony M Ontiveros, against Does 1-25, Malbrough, Sheonta, represented by Richard M Jacobson, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Complaint filed.
Date: January 31, 2020Answer filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: January 31, 2020Summons submitted by Abraham, Diane; Abraham, John rejected on 02/04/2020 .
Date: February 04, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: February 28, 2020Summons filed.
Date: February 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.