Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ruiz, Joanna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Seth R. Bradley, against Does 1-25, Danielle Marie Kolb, City Of Sacramento, represented by Katherine E Underwood, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThadd A. Blizzard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: July 01, 2020Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: March 16, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: January 31, 2020Summons filed.
Date: January 31, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: March 09, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: May 29, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.