Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Grenier, Noah Kazuki Tsunoda, Grenier, Manami Tsunoda, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Allen H. Sumner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen H. Sumner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: April 23, 2020Order - Other (to authorize telephonic appearance (granted)) filed.
Date: February 21, 2020Declaration - Other (of Hamid R Moussavian Re: Request to Appear Telephonically) filed.
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Proposed Order to Deposit filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Grenier, Manami Tsunoda rejected on 02/05/2020 .
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: February 28, 2020Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: February 24, 2020Order to Deposit filed.
Date: April 23, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.