Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mahoney, Caleb, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Allen H. Sumner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen H. Sumner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: May 28, 2020Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Proposed Order to Deposit filed.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 28, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 07/22/2020 03:37:00 PM .
Date: July 22, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 22, 2020Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.