Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Robles, Isabel, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Allen H. Sumner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen H. Sumner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Ashley Amerio Re GAL) filed.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Proposed Order to Deposit filed.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Maria Zarate Re: App GAL) filed.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 02/20/2020 03:37:00 PM .
Date: February 20, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 20, 2020Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 13, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.