Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hale Iii, Odell, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case against Happy Daze Rv, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 09, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: January 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: January 21, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: January 23, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 18, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.