We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Smart Choice Remodeling Inc Vs. David Shaw

Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago

Smart Choice Remodeling Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brian L Coggins, Jeremy Snider, Marc S Soble, against Castro, April Melissa, Does 1-50, Does 8-50, Ellis, Michael Craig, Shaw Jr, David R., (total of 10) See All represented by James J Kaufman, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 30, 2016

Last Refreshed

May 14, 2022

Filing Location

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Robert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Unlimited

Practice Area

Commercial

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Case Cycle Time

759 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

655 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Case Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00

Complaint filed.

Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00

Answer filed.

Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00

Cross-Complaint filed.

Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00

Summons filed.

Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00

Summons filed.

Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00

Association of Attorney filed.

Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00

Notice of Related Case filed.

Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00

Proof of Service filed.

Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00

Motion for Attorney Fees filed.

Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Date: January 07, 2019

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order to Set Aside Default) filed.
Docket Event Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Docket Event Abstract of Judgment Issued
Docket Event Judgment on court trial (updated with costs posted per cost memo)
Hearing Motion for Attorney Fees - Post Trial Motions
Heard

Judge: Robert C. Hight

Docket Event Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees - Post Trial Motions heard on 11/20/2018 09:30:00 AM .
Docket Event Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Docket Event Invoice for Attorney Fees submitted by defendant David Shaw.
Docket Event Tentative Ruling for Motion for Attorney Fees - Post Trial Motions set on 11/20/2018 09:30:00 AM published .
Tentative Ruling Defendant David. R. Shaw's motion for attorney's fees is ruled upon as follows. Background Plaintiff Smart Choice Remodeling, Inc. filed the underlying lawsuit against Defendant David R. Shaw for brea...

Judge: David De Alba

See all events