Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alavi, Azam, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Christopher L Kreeger, against Whicker, Robert, Whicker, Brittany, Does 1-10, represented by R James Miller, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David De Alba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid De Alba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: February 23, 2017Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: April 17, 2017Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: September 08, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.