Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitation, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Scott Kernan Secretary Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time540 days |
Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Jodie Shane Teragawa's Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to Seal Peace Officer Information) filed.
Date: December 21, 2016Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Writ of Mandate heard on 05/06/2016 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 01/06/2017 11:00:00 AM .
Date: January 06, 2017Tentative Ruling (Application for Stay of Administrative Decision) Filed
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Stay Administrative Decision) filed.
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment Granting Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Petition) filed.
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Judgment or Order) filed.
Date: June 14, 2017Answer filed.
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other (Regarding Exhibits) filed.
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (Declaration of Nechelle L Bixby) filed.
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Proposed Order (Granting Mtn to Seal Peace Officer Information) filed.
Date: May 10, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 05/20/2016 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Response (to Motion to Strike Declaration of Nechelle L Bixby) filed.
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Nechelle L Bixby) filed.
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Amended Petition (Amended Petition For Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed.
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling (Petition for Writ of Mandate; Cross Petition for Writ of Mandate) Filed
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Application - Other (for stay of administrative decision) filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling (Motion to Seal) Filed
Date: January 05, 2017Tentative Ruling (Motion to Strike Declaration of Nechelle L. Bixby) Filed
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Order - Other (Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 06/17/2016 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Hearing on Application for Stay of Adminstrative Decision) filed.
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Writ Hearing and Briefing Schedule) filed.
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Administrative Record) filed.
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Return to Peremptory Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.