Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Attorneys, Administrative Law Judges And Hearing Officers In State Employment, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Robert Dresser As Chair Of The California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board, Does 1-50, California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1483 days |
Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Application - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 12/14/2016 09:34:00 AM .
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Order - Other (ORDER AND NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE) filed.
Date: January 31, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail - Petition filed.
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Case reassigned to 25 effective 01/31/2019 .
Date: January 31, 2019Minutes finalized for heard on 01/09/2020 08:31:00 AM .
Date: January 09, 2020Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: September 11, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: January 09, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.