Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Csaa Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against De La Riva, Isabel, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Cadei Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Statement - Other (Parties joint list of proposed arbitrators) filed.
Date: February 29, 2016Request - Other (Request for court to appoint arbitrator) filed.
Date: June 14, 2016Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (For Order Nominating Arbitrators) filed.
Date: December 31, 2015First Paper - Other (Claimant's Response to Petition for Order Nominating Arbitrators) filed.
Date: February 05, 2016Order - Other (Order Nominating Arbitrators) filed.
Date: March 09, 2016Minutes finalized for heard on 06/22/2016 09:22:00 AM .
Date: June 22, 2016Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: June 22, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.