Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Performance Arbitrage Company Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ronnie Chow, against Does 1 - 10, Yarbrough, Craig, represented by Adam C Fullman, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions201 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time224 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: July 19, 2016Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.