Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jewell, Blaire, Jewell, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kyle K Tambornini, against Anderson, Brady W., Anderson, Cynthia, Does 1-25, represented by Kevin J Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions716 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time722 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Motion for Continuance of Trial filed.
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: November 01, 2017Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: December 15, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: August 23, 2017Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 02/22/2017 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.