Aghili, Ashras,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Jeffrey C Sevey,
against
Fitzgerald, Tracey,
Does 1 - 25,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Details for
Aghili, Ashras v. Fitzgerald, Tracey
, et al.
Case Events for
Aghili, Ashras v. Fitzgerald, Tracey
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
February 04, 2016
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
February 04, 2016
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 19, 2016
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
January 19, 2016
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 19, 2016
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
December 31, 2015
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
December 31, 2015
Docket Event
Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/31/2015 .