Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Progressive Northern Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mark R Nivinskus, against Does 1 - 20, Parfenov, Igor, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions397 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1176 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 28, 2017Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: January 30, 2017Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: June 28, 2017Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 06, 2018Certificate of Facts Re: Unsatisfied Judgment
Date: March 20, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.