Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Loannow Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jihee Kim, against Does 1 - 50, Argel, Eileen, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time299 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: October 17, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: September 29, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: October 24, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.
Date: 2016-02-05T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: September 29, 2016Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 585) filed.
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.