Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Priyanka,, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Cadei Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed.
Date: June 15, 2016Proof of Publication filed.
Date: February 04, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: June 23, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.