Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Abalos, Gabriel, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Sage Pools Retail Inc, Sage, Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Cadei Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions34 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Case Cycle Time255 days |
Notice - Other (of Late Opposition Filed to Petition) filed.
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Withdrawal of Peition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award) filed.
Date: 2016-02-03T00:00:00Objection (Opposition to Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award) filed.
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Martin N Jensen In support of Shawn Sages) filed.
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-02-02T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment by Court) filed.
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Support of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (on Petition) filed.
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Application - Other (For an Order moving hearing date) filed.
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of R.Cronin-Prather) filed.
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of M.Jensen) filed.
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 13, 2016Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: July 25, 2016Writ of Execution (Orange) Issued
Date: August 22, 2016Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: March 08, 2016Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: September 09, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.