Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Hunt, against Maupin, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions290 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time301 days |
Order - Other (Order Granting Motion to Deem Matters Admitted) filed.
Date: July 18, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: January 26, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: October 07, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.