Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Hunt, against Van Orden, Matthew T., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time314 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: October 31, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 11, 2016Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: February 22, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: April 12, 2016Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: February 22, 2016Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: February 22, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.