Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Viloria, Bienvenida, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by William Bowen, against Adams & Associates Inc, Does 1 - 25, represented by Michael G Pedhirney, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time79 days |
Answer filed.
Date: February 11, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: December 22, 2015Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: March 01, 2016Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 05, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: December 22, 2015Notice - Other (Notice of adverse party of removal of civil action) filed.
Date: March 01, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.